Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de la Cámara y Raya, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Nov 1612SelectedBishop of Panamá
15 Apr 1613ConfirmedBishop of Panamá
1614¹Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
28 Jun 1614InstalledBishop of Panamá
18 Aug 1624DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Cámara y Raya:
Bishop Francisco de la Cámara y Raya O.P. (died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 131, Number 837
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 272
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015