Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph McDonald

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Aquae Regiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1904Born
10 Jun 192823.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 196459.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
17 Mar 196459.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
19 May 196459.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
26 Jul 196763.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
5 Jun 197974.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
7 Jan 198984.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for William Joseph McDonald (VIAF: 52741462)
Bishop William Joseph McDonald (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Nov 2018

Quantcast