Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teodulfo Sabugal Domingo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1910BornBaggao
3 Apr 193827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tuguegarao, Philippines
29 Apr 195746.6AppointedBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
9 May 195746.6InstalledBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
2 Jul 195746.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
21 Sep 197464.0AppointedArchbishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
31 Jan 198675.4RetiredArchbishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
3 Jun 200291.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Teodulfo Sabugal Domingo:
Archbishop Teodulfo Sabugal Domingo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • i: CB, 18 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015