Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Sensi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1907BornCosenza, Italy
21 Dec 192922.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 195547.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
21 May 195547.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
24 Jul 195548.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sardes
14 Jan 195749.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
10 May 196254.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
8 Jul 196760.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
13 May 1976³68.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
24 May 197668.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari
24 May 197668.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 198780.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum
26 Jul 200194.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Sensi:
Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Sensi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

  • a priest for 71.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 57
  • ab/xxcr: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 463, and Page 655
  • ab/xxps: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 176
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015