Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) James Patrick Shannon

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (Renounced the Priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1921Born
8 Jun 194625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
8 Feb 196543.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
8 Feb 196543.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
31 Mar 196544.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
22 Nov 196847.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
196947.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
28 Aug 200382.5Died

MicroData Summary for James Patrick Shannon (VIAF: 54989664)
(Layman) James Patrick Shannon (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouth Saint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
Ordained PriestSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast