Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Harmon Shanley, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Infanta

Titular Bishop of Sophene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1896BornAthlone, Ireland
21 Dec 193034.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
17 Feb 195356.7AppointedPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
17 Feb 195356.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sophene
17 Mar 195356.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sophene
23 Jun 196165.1ResignedPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
2 Jan 197073.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Infanta, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Patrick Harmon Shanley:
Bishop Patrick Harmon Shanley O.C.D. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Infanta

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015