Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Rodly Caesar, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1932Born
4 Jun 196129.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Jul 197846.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
25 Oct 197846.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
30 Aug 198048.5SucceededBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
18 Jun 198755.3DiedBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Raymond Rodly Caesar
Bishop Raymond Rodly Caesar S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Goroka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEunice, LA, USA

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast