Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Albert Hammes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Superior, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1911Born
22 May 193725.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
28 Mar 196048.5AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
24 May 196048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
7 Jun 196048.7InstalledBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
27 Jun 198573.7ResignedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
11 Apr 199381.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Superior, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for George Albert Hammes
Bishop George Albert Hammes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Superior

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Joseph’s Ridge
Ordained BishopCivic Auditorium, Superior, Diocese of Superior, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 59
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast