Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Warren Louis Boudreaux

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1918Born
30 May 194224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
19 May 196244.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
19 May 196244.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Calynda
25 Jul 196244.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calynda
4 Jun 197153.3AppointedBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
25 Aug 197153.5InstalledBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
2 Mar 197759.1AppointedBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
5 Jun 197759.3InstalledBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
29 Dec 199274.9RetiredBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
6 Oct 199779.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Warren Louis Boudreaux
Bishop Warren Louis Boudreaux (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Houma-Thibodaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerwick

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 20 Feb 2018