Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odilo Etspueler, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bangued


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1912BornGuenzgen-Hohentengen, Germany
14 May 194229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
20 Aug 195643.8AppointedPrelate of Bangued, Philippines
20 Aug 195643.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Fata
11 Oct 195643.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fata
18 Feb 197865.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Fata
15 Nov 198270.0AppointedBishop of Bangued, Philippines
20 Nov 198775.0RetiredBishop of Bangued, Philippines
12 Sep 199582.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bangued, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Odilo Etspueler:
Bishop Odilo Etspueler S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bangued

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013