Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Cinense y Abera

Deceased

Archbishop of San Fernando


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1911BornGuimba
6 Apr 193523.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 195745.5AppointedBishop of San Fernando, Philippines
11 May 195745.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Fernando, Philippines
17 Mar 197563.5AppointedArchbishop of San Fernando, Philippines
5 May 197866.7DiedArchbishop of San Fernando, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Emilio Cinense y Abera:
Archbishop Emilio Cinense y Abera (born , died ) Archbishop of San Fernando

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013