Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eldon Bernard Schuster

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Great Falls-Billings, Montana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1911BornCalio, ND
27 May 193726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Great Falls, Montana, USA
30 Oct 196150.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
30 Oct 196150.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amblada
21 Dec 196150.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amblada
2 Dec 196756.7AppointedBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
23 Jan 196856.9InstalledBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
27 Dec 197766.8ResignedBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
4 Sep 199887.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for Eldon Bernard Schuster:
Bishop Eldon Bernard Schuster (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Great Falls-Billings

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013