Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Stephen Skylstad

Bishop Emeritus of Spokane, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1934 Born
21 May 196026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Spokane, Washington, USA
16 Feb 197742.9AppointedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
12 May 197743.1Ordained BishopBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
17 Apr 199056.1AppointedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
30 Jun 201076.3RetiredBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
24 Jan 201176.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Baker, Oregon, USA
8 Mar 201278.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Baker, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for William Stephen Skylstad
Bishop William Stephen Skylstad (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Spokane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMethow

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Spokane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast