Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clarence Edward Elwell

Deceased

Bishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1904Born
17 Mar 192925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
5 Nov 196258.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
5 Nov 196258.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cone
21 Dec 196258.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cone
24 May 196864.3AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
22 Aug 196864.5InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
16 Feb 197369.0DiedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Clarence Edward Elwell
Bishop Clarence Edward Elwell (born , died ) Bishop of Columbus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 189
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast