Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Eugene Fellhauer

Bishop Emeritus of Victoria in Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1939 Born
29 May 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas, USA
7 Apr 199050.6AppointedBishop of Victoria in Texas, USA
28 May 199050.7Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria in Texas, USA
23 Apr 201575.6RetiredBishop of Victoria in Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for David Eugene Fellhauer
Bishop David Eugene Fellhauer (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Victoria in Texas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKansas City, MO, Diocese of Kansas City, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Victoria in Texas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,968
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018