Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Porcia Yap

Deceased

Bishop of Bacolod


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1900BornCárcar
21 Sep 192929.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 195150.6AppointedBishop of Capiz, Philippines
1 May 195150.8Ordained BishopBishop of Capiz, Philippines
5 Mar 195251.7AppointedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
16 Oct 196666.3DiedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Manuel Porcia Yap:
Bishop Manuel Porcia Yap (born , died ) Bishop of Bacolod

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 40
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015