Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romeo Roy Blanchette

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1913BornSt. George, IL
3 Apr 193724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
8 Feb 196552.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
8 Feb 196552.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
3 Apr 196552.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita
19 Jul 196653.5AppointedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
30 Jan 197966.1ResignedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
10 Jan 198269.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Romeo Roy Blanchette:
Bishop Romeo Roy Blanchette (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013