Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Francis Whealon

Deceased

Archbishop of Hartford, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1921BornBarberton, OH
26 May 194524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
5 Jun 196140.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
5 Jun 196140.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Andrapa
6 Jul 196140.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andrapa
9 Dec 196645.9AppointedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Dec 196847.9AppointedArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
2 Aug 199170.5DiedArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Whealon:
Archbishop John Francis Whealon (born , died ) Archbishop of Hartford

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015