Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Graham Connare

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Greensburg, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1911BornPittsburgh
14 Jun 193624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Feb 196048.1AppointedBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
4 May 196048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Jan 198775.1RetiredBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Jun 199583.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for William Graham Connare:
Bishop William Graham Connare (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Greensburg

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015