Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Thomas Maher

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Diego, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1915Born
18 Dec 194328.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 196246.5AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa (in California), USA
5 Apr 196246.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa (in California), USA
22 Aug 196954.1AppointedBishop of San Diego, California, USA
10 Jul 199075.0RetiredBishop of San Diego, California, USA
23 Feb 199175.6DiedBishop Emeritus of San Diego, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Thomas Maher
Bishop Leo Thomas Maher (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Diego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMount Union, IA

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 May 2017