Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Yves Riocreux

Bishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1946 BornMarlhes
31 Mar 197428.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nouméa, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
22 Jun 197428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nouméa, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
5 May 200357.2AppointedBishop of Pontoise, France
29 Jun 200357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pontoise, France
15 Jun 201266.3AppointedBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
30 Sep 201266.6InstalledBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Jean-Yves Riocreux:
Bishop Jean-Yves Riocreux (born ) Bishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,419
  • c01/od/i: CB, 28 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014