Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olivier Jean-Marie Michel de Berranger, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1938Born
4 Jul 196425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
6 Sep 199657.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Denis, France
19 Oct 199657.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis, France
15 Jan 200970.1ResignedBishop of Saint-Denis, France
23 May 201778.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis, France

MicroData Summary for Olivier Jean-Marie Michel de Berranger (VIAF: 5132359)
Bishop Olivier Jean-Marie Michel de Berranger Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourbevoie
Death PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,858
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017