Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolphe-Maria Gustave Hardy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1920BornNantes
31 Mar 194524.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 198564.7AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
12 May 198564.8Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
13 May 199574.8RetiredBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
9 Aug 201191.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Adolphe-Maria Gustave Hardy:
Bishop Adolphe-Maria Gustave Hardy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Aug 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013