Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Theodor Buddenbrock, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1878Born
190122.5ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
24 Feb 190526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
25 Nov 192446.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lanchowfu, China
18 Dec 192446.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Issus
7 Jun 192546.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Issus
11 Apr 194667.8AppointedArchbishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow], China
18 Jan 195980.5DiedArchbishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow], China

MicroData Summary for Theodor Buddenbrock
Archbishop Theodor Buddenbrock S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLippramsdorf, Germany

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast