Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Cheng Youxian (Cheng Youhin)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Süanhwafu, China

Titular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1881Born
13 Mar 190423.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 192847.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Süanhwafu, China
28 Mar 192847.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
2 Jul 192847.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
25 Aug 193554.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Süanhwafu, China

MicroData Summary for Pierre Cheng Youxian (Cheng Youhin)
Bishop Pierre Cheng Youxian (Cheng Youhin) (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Süanhwafu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTs'ao-kia-yao, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin
Ordained BishopPeking, Vicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]
Death PlaceSüanhwafu, Vicariate Apostolic of Süanhwafu

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,936
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 44
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast