Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis O’Shea, M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Heijo, Korea (North)

Titular Bishop of Naissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1884Born
5 Dec 191732.9Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
11 Jul 193954.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Heijo, Korea (North)
11 Jul 193954.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Naissus
29 Oct 193954.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naissus
17 Apr 194459.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Heijo, Korea (North)
22 Feb 194560.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Heijo, Korea (North)

MicroData Summary for William Francis O’Shea
Bishop William Francis O’Shea M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Heijo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, USA

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 66
  • r: CB, 27 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast