Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Theodor Suhr, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}, Denmark


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1896Born
10 Feb 192832.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Apr 193337.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Dec 193842.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Denmark
13 Dec 193842.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Balecium
15 Jan 193942.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balecium
29 Apr 195357.2AppointedBishop of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}, Denmark
6 Oct 196468.7ResignedBishop of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}, Denmark
6 Oct 196468.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
16 Jun 197680.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
10 Mar 1997101.1DiedBishop Emeritus of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}, Denmark

MicroData Summary for Johannes Theodor Suhr (VIAF: 229673402)
Bishop Johannes Theodor Suhr O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyborg
Ordained BishopSan Girolamo in Urbe, Abbey, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAabenraa, Diocese of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}
Buried Place (Original)Vestre, Cemetery, KÝbenhavn, Diocese of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 58.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1,939, Number 2
  • prof: CB, 3 May 2019
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast