Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Canazei, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Shaoguan [Shiuchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1883Born
190117.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Sep 190926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Jul 193047.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shiuchow [Shaoguan], China
23 Jul 193047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
9 Nov 193047.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
11 Apr 194662.8AppointedBishop of Shaoguan [Shiuchow], China
12 Oct 194663.3DiedBishop of Shaoguan [Shiuchow], China

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Canazei
Bishop Ignazio Canazei S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Shaoguan [Shiuchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBressanone, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Ordained BishopShiuchow, Vicariate Apostolic of Shiuchow [Shaoguan]
Death PlaceShiuchow, Diocese of Shaoguan [Shiuchow]

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 82
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast