Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior Sun Dezhen (Souen), C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ankwo [Anguo]

Titular Bishop of Esbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1869BornBeijing, China
24 Jan 189727.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 189929.2ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Apr 192454.4AppointedPrefect of Lihsien, China
17 Jul 192454.7InstalledPrefect of Lihsien, China
24 Jun 192656.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
28 Oct 192656.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Esbus
15 Jul 192959.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ankwo [Anguo], China
7 Feb 193666.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Ankwo [Anguo], China
23 Aug 195181.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ankwo [Anguo], China

MicroData Summary for Melchior Sun Dezhen (Souen):
Bishop Melchior Sun Dezhen (Souen) C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ankwo [Anguo]

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013