Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Zhao Huai-yi (Tchao)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of SŘanhwafu

Titular Bishop of Vaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1880BornBeijing
27 Feb 190423.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 192645.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of SŘanhwafu, China
24 Jun 192645.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
28 Oct 192646.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
14 Oct 192747.0DiedVicar Apostolic of SŘanhwafu, China

MicroData Summary for Philippe Zhao Huai-yi (Tchao):
Bishop Philippe Zhao Huai-yi (Tchao) (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of SŘanhwafu

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1926, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015