Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Nakabaale Kiwánuka, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rubaga, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1899Born
26 May 192929.9Ordained PriestPriest of Uganda
12 Oct 193435.2ProfessedPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
25 May 193939.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Masaka, Uganda
25 May 193939.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibica
29 Oct 193940.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibica
25 Mar 195353.7AppointedBishop of Masaka, Uganda
20 Dec 196061.4AppointedArchbishop of Rubaga, Uganda
22 Feb 196666.6DiedArchbishop of Rubaga, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nakabaale Kiwánuka (VIAF: 298251586)
Archbishop Joseph Nakabaale Kiwánuka M. Afr. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rubaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNakirebe
Ordained PriestVilla Maria, Vicariate Apostolic of Masaka
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rubaga, Archdiocese of Rubaga

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 60
  • mn/opd: CB, 16 Oct 2017
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast