Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Attipetty

Deceased

Archbishop of Verapoly, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1894Born
18 Dec 192632.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 193238.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Verapoly, India
29 Nov 193238.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabula
11 Jun 193338.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gabula
15 Nov 193440.3SucceededArchbishop of Verapoly, India
21 Jan 197075.5DiedArchbishop of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Attipetty
Archbishop Joseph Attipetty (born , died ) Archbishop of Verapoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOchanthuruth

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast