Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Brizi

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1891Born
23 Feb 191827.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 194554.0AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
11 Feb 194554.0Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
11 Feb 196473.0DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Brizi
Bishop Domenico Brizi (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuscania

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast