Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Weig, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tsingtao [Qingdao], China

Titular Bishop of Antandrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1883Born
31 Oct 190622.8ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
10 Feb 190723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
18 Mar 192541.2AppointedPrefect of Tsingtao [Qingdao], China
15 Jun 192844.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antandrus
15 Jun 192844.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tsingtao [Qingdao], China
23 Sep 192844.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antandrus
3 Oct 194157.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Tsingtao [Qingdao], China

MicroData Summary for Georg Weig
Bishop Georg Weig S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tsingtao [Qingdao]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeratzhausen, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany
Ordained BishopYenchowfu
Death PlaceTsingtao, Vicariate Apostolic of Tsingtao [Qingdao]

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 62
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast