Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Trieste

Dioecesis Tergestina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Enrico Trevisi, Bishop
  • Giampaolo Crepaldi, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 17 October 1977
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Gorizia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 134 (51 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Triveneto
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.trieste.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Via Cavana 16, 34124 Trieste, Italia
  • Telephone: 040.318.54.11
  • Fax: 040.318.54.30

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Trieste
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Trieste (erected)
1787Territory AddedDiocese of Pedena (suppressed) Diocese of Gradisca (d’Isonzo) (erected)
Diocese of Trieste
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
30 June 1828UnitedDiocese of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)
Diocese of Trieste
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
30 June 1828Territory AddedDiocese of Novigrad (Cittanova) (suppressed) Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
25 April 1925Territory LostDiocese of Ljubljana
Apostolic Administration of Fiume / Rijeka
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija)
10 February 1933Territory AddedDiocese of Ljubljana (Deanery of Postumia) Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
28 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper) (Matteria and Castelnuovo) Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija)
18 April 1942Territory AddedDiocese of Ljubljana (Boundaries adjusted)
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper) (Boundaries adjusted)
17 March 1958Territory AddedArchdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca (S. Croce and the parish of S. Rochi in Aurisina) Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
17 October 1977SplitDiocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper) Diocese of Koper
Diocese of Trieste
17 October 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca ((areas in Slovenia))
Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija) ((areas in Slovenia))
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper) ((areas in Slovenia))
Diocese of Koper
Diocese of Trieste
17 October 1977SplitDiocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper) Diocese of Koper
Diocese of Trieste

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
1950370,000380,00097.4%165652301,6089051059ap1951
1970300,000310,00096.8%187752621,1459857153ap1971
Diocese of Trieste
1980273,500284,70096.1%150832331,17310256556ap1981
1990247,500253,34697.7%137762131,16149033160ap1991
1999219,715237,28992.6%112621741,26267124560ap2000
2000242,000251,50096.2%119651841,31577624560ap2001
2001217,818236,25392.2%120601801,21087526361ap2002
2002217,818236,25392.2%110491591,369106318661ap2003
2003217,818236,25392.2%115651801,21097616661ap2004
2004219,000243,90389.8%106601661,319106618260ap2005
2010221,700241,80091.7%83491321,679155817460ap2011
2014223,300243,40091.7%94571511,478176313959ap2015
2017230,000241,80095.1%114611751,314156912660ap2018
2020217,585241,90089.9%126491751,243155511060ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Trieste
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 477
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 247
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 310
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 330
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 371
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 397
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 362
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 319, to Page 320
  • Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 541
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 361
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 25, Page 456, and Page 457
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 34, Page 231
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 50, Page 627, to Page 629
  • Diocese of Trieste
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 69, Page 689, to Page 691

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 11 Feb 2024