Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Mansour Zayek

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1920BornManzanillo, Cuba
17 Mar 194625.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 196241.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
30 May 196241.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum dei Maroniti
5 Aug 196241.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum dei Maroniti
27 Jan 196645.2AppointedBishop of United States of America (Maronite)
29 Nov 197151.1AppointedBishop of Saint Maron of Detroit (Maronite), Michigan, USA
10 Dec 198262.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
11 Nov 199676.0RetiredBishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
14 Sep 201089.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Mansour Zayek:
Archbishop Francis Mansour Zayek (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Brooklyn

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 116
  • ab/u008: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1971, Page 795, and Page 577
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014