Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Wang Wen-cheng (Uamuencem)

Deceased

Bishop of Nanchong [Shunking]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1881BornKian-yu
9 Aug 191129.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 192948.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shunking [Nanchong], China
16 Dec 192948.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
24 Feb 193048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
11 Apr 194664.5AppointedBishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China
28 Jan 196179.3DiedBishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Wang Wen-cheng (Uamuencem):
Bishop Paul Wang Wen-cheng (Uamuencem) (born , died ) Bishop of Nanchong [Shunking]

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015