Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odoric Simon Tcheng Hede (Cheng Hede), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Puchi [Puqi], China

Titular Bishop of Cotenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1873Born
189420.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jul 190026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Mar 192450.4AppointedPrefect of Puchi [Puqi], China
24 Jun 192652.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cotenna
28 Oct 192653.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cotenna
14 Nov 192855.1DiedPrefect of Puchi [Puqi], China

MicroData Summary for Odoric Simon Tcheng Hede (Cheng Hede)
Bishop Odoric Simon Tcheng Hede (Cheng Hede) O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Puchi [Puqi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaohokow
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceShangsha

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,926, Number 74
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast