Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Respighi

Deceased

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

President of the Congregation of Apostolic Visitation

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1843Born
23 Dec 186522.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bologna, Italy
31 Mar 186622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
14 Dec 189148.2AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
20 Dec 189148.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
30 Nov 189653.1AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
19 Jun 189955.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189955.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
9 Apr 190056.5AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
9 Apr 190056.5AppointedPresident of the Congregation of Apostolic Visitation
9 Apr 190056.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops
19 Apr 190056.5ResignedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
29 Jun 190864.7ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops
10 Jan 191066.3AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
22 Mar 191369.5DiedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Respighi (VIAF: 305115038)
Pietro Cardinal Respighi (born , died ) Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopDames du Sacre-Coeur, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Santi Quattro Coronati, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 270, and Page 294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017