Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alcide Giuseppe Marina, C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1887Born
18 Dec 190922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
7 Mar 193648.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
7 Mar 193648.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Persia
24 May 193649.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
18 Apr 194558.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
22 Mar 194759.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
18 Sep 195063.4DiedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Alcide Giuseppe Marina
Archbishop Alcide Giuseppe Marina C.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Lebanon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantimento, Diocese of Piacenza, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 36
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast