Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blasius Sigibald Kurz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China

Titular Bishop of Terenuthis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1894Born
191419.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Dec 191925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Jul 193541.4AppointedPrefect of Mount Currie, South Africa
11 Jul 193945.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Terenuthis
11 Jul 193945.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kokstad, South Africa
29 Oct 193945.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Terenuthis
21 May 194854.2AppointedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China
13 Dec 197379.8DiedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China

MicroData Summary for Blasius Sigibald Kurz
Bishop Blasius Sigibald Kurz O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Lingling [Yungchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSontheim, Diocese of Rottenburg, Germany
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceWaldsassen

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,939, Number 63
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 13 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast