Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hu Ruoshan (Hu Joo-shan, Hu Jo-shan), C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linhai [Taichow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1881Born
190624.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
5 Jun 190928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
30 Jul 192645.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Taichow [Linhai], China
30 Jul 192645.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis
28 Oct 192645.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis
11 Apr 194665.1AppointedBishop of Linhai [Taichow], China
28 Aug 196281.5DiedBishop of Linhai [Taichow], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hu Ruoshan (Hu Joo-shan, Hu Jo-shan)
Bishop Joseph Hu Ruoshan (Hu Joo-shan, Hu Jo-shan) C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Linhai [Taichow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChusan
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePrison, Hangzhou, Archdiocese of Hangzhou [Hangchow]

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,926, Number 75
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast