Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Léon Cornelius Montaigne, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Peking [Beijing]

Titular Bishop of Sidyma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1883BornTerdeghem, France
190117.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
25 May 190723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
25 Nov 192441.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Paotingfu, China
18 Dec 192441.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
19 Apr 192541.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidyma
25 Jan 193046.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China
27 Jan 193349.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China
11 Apr 194662.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China
9 Jan 196278.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Peking [Beijing], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Léon Cornelius Montaigne:
Bishop Paul Léon Cornelius Montaigne C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Peking [Beijing]

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013