Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Slivovsky

Deceased

Bishop of Vladivostok


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1845BornVladivostok
1883¹37.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 192377.6AppointedBishop of Vladivostok, Russian Federation
28 Oct 192378.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vladivostok, Russian Federation
6 Jan 193387.5DiedBishop of Vladivostok, Russian Federation

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karol Slivovsky:
Bishop Karol Slivovsky (born , died ) Bishop of Vladivostok

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013