Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Roch Agniswami, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kottar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1891BornTrichinopoly
25 Nov 192332.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Jan 193947.8AppointedBishop of Kottar, India
29 Oct 193948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kottar, India
23 Nov 197079.7RetiredBishop of Kottar, India
7 May 197483.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kottar, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Roch Agniswami:
Bishop Thomas Roch Agniswami S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kottar

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013