Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Faustino Sainz Muñoz

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Novaliciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1937Born
19 Dec 196427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
29 Oct 198851.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novaliciana
29 Oct 198851.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cuba
18 Dec 198851.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Novaliciana
7 Oct 199255.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
21 Jan 199961.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to European Community
11 Dec 200467.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain
5 Dec 201073.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain
31 Oct 201275.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Faustino Sainz Muñoz
Archbishop Faustino Sainz Muñoz (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Great Britain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmadén, Ciudad Real, Territorial Prelature of Ciudad Real, Spain
Ordained PriestSanta María la Real de la Almudena, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain
Buried Place (Original)La Concepción de Nuestra Señora, Church, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,927
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast