Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Buoncristiani

Archbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1943 Born
13 Jul 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Foligno, Italy
21 Jul 199450.5AppointedBishop of Porto-Santa Rufina, Italy
1 Oct 199450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Porto-Santa Rufina, Italy
23 Oct 199450.8InstalledBishop of Porto-Santa Rufina, Italy
23 May 200157.4AppointedArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
24 Jun 200157.5InstalledArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Buoncristiani (VIAF: 81734172)
Archbishop Antonio Buoncristiani (born ) Archbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerreto di Spoleto, Archdiocese of Spoleto
Ordained BishopSan Feliciano, Cathedral, Foligno, Diocese of Foligno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,530
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc/opd: AM, 22 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast