Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fortunato Cardinal Baldelli

Deceased

Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1935Born
18 Mar 196125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
12 Feb 198347.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mevania
12 Feb 198347.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Angola
23 Apr 198347.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mevania
4 May 198549.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe
20 Apr 199155.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
20 Apr 199155.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
23 Apr 199458.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
19 Jun 199963.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
2 Jun 200973.8AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
20 Nov 201075.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino
20 Nov 201075.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 Feb 201175.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino
5 Jan 201276.4RetiredMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
20 Sep 201277.1DiedMajor Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Baldelli
Fortunato Cardinal Baldelli (born , died ) Major Penitentiary Emeritus of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValfabbrica, Italy

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2012
  • d: CB, 21 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Aug 2017