Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco De Nittis

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Uruguay

Titular Archbishop of Tunes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1933BornVieste, Italy
15 Jul 195623.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 198147.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tunes
7 Mar 198147.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
7 Mar 198147.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Solomon Islands
2 May 198147.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tunes
24 Jan 198551.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
10 Apr 198652.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
25 Jun 199056.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
Aug 1999³66.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
10 Mar 201480.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Uruguay

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco De Nittis:
Archbishop Francesco De Nittis (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Uruguay

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Mar 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015