Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugenio Sbarbaro

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Serbia

Titular Archbishop of Tiddi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1934 BornBelpiano di Borzonasca, Italy
11 Jun 196025.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 198551.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tiddi
14 Sep 198551.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Malawi
14 Sep 198551.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Zambia
19 Oct 198551.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tiddi
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Bahamas, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Barbados, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Dominica, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Jamaica, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Grenada, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Saint Lucia, Antilles
7 Feb 199156.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda, Antilles
13 Jul 199460.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Suriname, Antilles
26 Aug 199763.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guyana, Antilles
23 Oct 199965.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Kitts and Nevis, Antilles
26 Apr 200065.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yugoslavia
200267.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Serbia and Montenegro
19 Jun 200671.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Serbia
8 Aug 200975.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Serbia

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Sbarbaro:
Archbishop Eugenio Sbarbaro (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Serbia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Serbia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 13 Jun 2015